FL H1077 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Construction Industry Licensing Board to take specified actions against certain entities; provides requirements related to open and expired permits, including expiration, uncompleted permitted projects, penalties, amendment of Florida Building Code, powers of local governmental entities, applications, & notice requirements.
Title
Open and Expired Building Permits
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Diamond [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-12-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1322 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
489 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 7905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1077 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1077/BillText/Filed/PDF |