FL H1077 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes specified entities to install & operate renewable energy source devices on certain structures where business operates; authorizes owner to sell electricity generated from device to certain businesses; authorizes electric utility to install & operate renewable energy source device on structure where business operates & sell electricity to business or others; authorizes electric utility to recover certain costs; authorizes customers to challenge certain fees.
Title
Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1118 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1077 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1077/BillText/Filed/PDF |