FL H1077 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 390 (Ch. 2013-126)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 390 (Ch. 2013-126)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that is it unlawful for person in connection with planning, conduct, or execution of solicitation or charitable or sponsor sales promotion to falsely state that he or she is member of or represents veterans' charitable organization or sponsor in certain circumstances or is member of or represents law enforcement or emergency service organization; subjects violators to penalties.
Title
Veterans' Charitable Organizations or Sponsors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 390 (Ch. 2013-126) |
2013-04-30 | House | Substituted CS/CS/CS/SB 390 |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 2:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2013-04-09 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/09/13, 2:30 pm, 404 HOB |
2013-04-02 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-04-02 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-04-01 | House | CS by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-27 | House | CS by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0390 (Similar To) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-126