FL H1077 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE guidelines for school district parent guide to include information regarding parental permission for certain instruction; authorizes school district to include parental consent form in parent guide; revises required instruction relating to comprehensive health education; specifies that student needs parental permission to be taught reproductive health or sexually transmitted disease education.
Title
Public School Instruction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 210 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 94 | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 148 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1077 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1077/BillText/Filed/HTML |