FL H1075 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & provides requirements relating to community associations, including contracts, documents, records, assessments, fines, liens, improvements, online voting, & electronic notice.
Title
Community Associations
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Judiciary Committee | House Business and Professions Subcommittee | Rep. Anthony Rodriguez [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | CS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-19 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-18 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/18/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall |
2019-04-05 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-03 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-04-01 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee; Commerce Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1362 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
514 | 0115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
712 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 5014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 3085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |