FL H1073 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Water Oversight & Planning Board to address state water issues; provides membership for board; provides duties of board; requires board to submit long-range plans to DEP & water management districts; requires water management districts to amend regional water supply plans in certain circumstances; requires board to provide to Legislature recommendations for appropriations & legislative changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Oversight and Planning

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1436 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback