FL H1067 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for physician assistants & advanced registered nurse practitioners to provide certification of death or fetal death under certain conditions; requires supervising physician to verify certification within specified timeframe.
Title
Death and Fetal Death Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/05/11, 9:00 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-03-29 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 366 | |
2011-03-28 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 340 | |
2011-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee, 03/22/11, 8:30 am, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to HHS Quality Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 210 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 93 | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |