FL H1067 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to rural infrastructure projects; revises percentage of total infrastructure project costs for which OTTED may award grants; authorizes OTTED to award grants for certain percentage of total infrastructure project costs for certain rural areas of critical economic concern; requires that funds from purchase of certain lands by state or state agency be appropriated into Rural Infrastructure Fund.
Title
Rural Infrastructure Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Economic Development Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Economic Development Policy (EDCA); Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00095 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Economic Development Policy (EDCA); Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Transportation & Economic Development Appropriations (CEED); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-02-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1984 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce