FL H1063 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Financial Responsibility Law of 2017; revises security requirements & proof of such security for owners & operators of motor vehicles; provides conditions, requirements, & dispute procedures for medical payments coverage; repeals portion of Florida Motor Vehicle No-Fault Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#145 (Y: 89 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-04-25SenateReceived
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-04-20SenateIn Messages
2017-04-19HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 89 NAYS 29
2017-04-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-18HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-18HouseAmendment(s) adopted (561239) 714
2017-04-18HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-13HouseCS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-13HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-04-13HouseCS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 5
2017-04-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/13/17, 10:00 am, Webster Hall
2017-04-03HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2017-04-03HouseCS referred to Commerce Committee
2017-04-03HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Judiciary Committee
2017-03-31HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-31HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-27HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2
2017-03-23HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/27/17, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Commerce Committee
2017-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S156 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H461 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
S1766 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
S1768 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316646Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3200609Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320771Amended CodeSee Bill Text
322251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3240221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
324251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269541Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626989Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62706501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270652Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6270653Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277266Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627727Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627728Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627730Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627733Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627734Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627737Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627739Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6277415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627745Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6278405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627915Amended CodeSee Bill Text
628909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705184Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71378Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817234Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback