FL H1063 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises audit provisions to exclude water management districts; revises responsibilities of department heads, Supreme Court, Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation, Justice Administrative Commission, each state attorney & public defender, criminal conflict & civil regional counsel, capital collateral counsel, Guardian Ad Litem program, local governmental entities, & governing bodies of charter schools to include responsibility of establishing certain internal controls; requires each Florida College System institution to file certain annual financial statements with State Board of Education; requires each school district, Florida College System institution, & state university to establish certain internal controls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Accountability

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied on Calendar
2015-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-15HouseCS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2015-04-15HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-14HouseCS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-04-10HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time
2015-04-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/14/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-04-10HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2015-04-09HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-04-07HouseCS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0
2015-04-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/07/15, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall
2015-03-27HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2015-03-26HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-24HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1372 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11231455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11231456Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12906Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
189016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21586Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21597Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21839Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2835Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28892Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2889604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373536Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
68082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
68083Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/BillText/c3/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/Amendment/464619/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/Amendment/657885/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/Amendment/529593/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/Amendment/900973/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/Amendment/338743/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/Amendment/927931/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/Amendment/232809/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/Amendment/360713/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/Amendment/096657/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1063/Amendment/259641/PDF

Bill Comments

feedback