FL H1063 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals ch. 205, F.S., "Local Business Tax Act"; authorizes continuation of local business taxation, notwithstanding repeal, to extent necessary to meet specified debt obligations secured by local business tax revenues; requires certain excess amounts of revenue collected from continuation of local business taxation to be refunded to taxpayers on pro rata basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Business Taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Finance and Tax Committee
2012-01-24 PCS on Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 01/26/12, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall --Temporarily deferred
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 104
2011-12-28 Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 104
2011-12-16 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2050315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2050532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2050535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2050536Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2050537Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205064Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205194Amended CodeSee Bill Text
205196Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2051965Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2051967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2051969Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2051971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2051973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2051975Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2130535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213756Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
337401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37684Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3793761Amended CodeSee Bill Text
482071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
482242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489119Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489128Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489516Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4895315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489533Amended CodeSee Bill Text
489537Amended CodeSee Bill Text
500511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501160Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50713Amended CodeSee Bill Text
539001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559939Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback