FL H1057 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes certain reporting requirements applicable to AHCA, certain requirements for Medicaid Pharmaceutical & Therapeutics Committee, & provisions relating to agency's implementation of prescribed-drug spending-control program & Organ Transplant Advisory Council.
Title
Agency for Health Care Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#64 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#145 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#145 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-151 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1292 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-12 | House | Amendment 597461 withdrawn |
2021-04-09 | House | Amendment 597461 filed |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-03-18 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-12 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-11 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-10 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-10 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with CS by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-04 | House | Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1292 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1057 (Ch. 2021-151)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
402 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 91195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 91213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 913 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |