FL H1055 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing requirements for the representation of Children's Medical Services on multiagency teams investigating certain child deaths or other serious incidents; requiring the Statewide Medical Director for Child Protection and the district medical directors to hold certain qualifications; providing that a physician who holds an expert witness certificate may provide expert testimony in criminal child abuse and neglect cases, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Protection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#132 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Chapter No. 2015-177
2015-06-16 Approved by Governor
2015-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2015-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-22SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 760
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-22SenateWithdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Policy; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-21SenateReceived
2015-04-21SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Policy; Fiscal Policy
2015-04-21SenateIn Messages
2015-04-16HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 1
2015-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-15HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-15HouseAmendment(s) adopted (169769, 456119)
2015-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15
2015-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-26HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2015-03-26HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-26HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-03-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2015-03-23HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2015-03-23HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2015-03-23HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-03-20HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-20HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-17HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-03-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0760 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1055 (Ch. 2015-177)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
392015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
391026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82703Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/Amendment/923691/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/Amendment/180267/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/Amendment/310291/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/Amendment/169769/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/Amendment/456119/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/Vote/HouseVote_h1055e1132.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1055/Vote/SenateVote_h1055e1015.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback