FL H1055 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions relating to site selection of community residential homes; revises definition of "community residential home" & defines "sober house transitional living home"; requires supervision of residents of such home; requires sober house transitional living home to comply with standards of occupancy set by local government; provides restrictions on provision of onsite substance abuse treatment services; limits applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Residential Homes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-10 Referred to HHS Access Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 210
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 92
2011-02-28 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
419001Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback