FL H1051 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires periodic statements for residential mortgage loans to follow specified laws; requires mortgage servicers & mortgage lenders to assume duties & obligations related to previously approved loan modifications; prohibits mortgage servicers & mortgage lenders from commencing civil actions, recording specified notices, & conducting foreclosures of sale unless specified conditions are met; requires mortgage servicers & mortgage lenders to establish single points of contact; requires mortgage servicers & mortgage lenders to send written acknowledgment of application receipt to foreclosure prevention alternative applicants in specified manners within specified timeframe; prohibits mortgage servicers & mortgage lenders from charging specified fees; prohibits insurers & insurance agents from engaging in certain acts relating to lender-placed insurance for residential mortgage loan guaranty.
Title
Servicers and Lenders of Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-12-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1706 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
494 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00163 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 0027 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
635 | 0215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
702 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1051 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1051/BillText/Filed/PDF |