FL H1051 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides definition of term "at-risk veteran"; provides that FDLE, as state Camo Alert coordinator, & certain agencies, employees, individuals, & entities are immune from civil liability for performing certain actions in good faith; authorizes law enforcement agency having jurisdiction over case to make request to clearinghouse for activation of Camo Alert involving missing adult; requires clearinghouse to establish & maintain Camo Alert Voluntary Registry within Missing Endangered Persons Information Clearinghouse; provides for voluntary registration of at-risk veteran; provides requirements for removal & expungement of at-risk veteran's registration & information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Missing Persons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-12-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1053 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1476 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs and Space
S1478 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs and Space

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9370201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
937021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9370215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
937022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
937023Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback