FL H1047 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires law enforcement officer with jurisdiction to place specified written hold order on certain goods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secondhand Dealers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2015-03-08HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0944 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53806Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback