FL H1045 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to electrolysis including provisions relating to the Board of Medicine & Electrolysis Advisory Council, licensure requirements, national examination, certification & training requirements for use of specified devices, continuing education, & disciplinary grounds.
Title
Electrolysis
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Fine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1286 (Same As) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
478 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
478 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1045 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1045/BillText/Filed/PDF |