FL H1043 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires district school boards to provide transportation for certain students; authorizes any party to request review of hazardous walking condition; provides inspection & reporting requirements upon completion of such request; requires superintendents to provide specified report & recommendation; requires district school board to initiate specified proceeding relating to hazardous walking conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-07HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-12-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1410 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100623Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101168Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback