FL H1037 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 268
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying & location information of current or former public guardians, employees with fiduciary responsibility, & spouses & children thereof; provides definition of term "employee with fiduciary responsibility"; provides for retroactive application; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Public Guardians/Employees with Fiduciary Responsibility

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 268
2018-03-05HouseSubstituted CS/CS/CS/SB 268
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-02HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-02HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2018-02-02HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-01HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/01/18, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-23HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-23HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-19HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-01-18HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-17HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-03HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-12-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S268 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-16

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
74421031Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback