FL H1033 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies students who have been awarded certificates of completion are eligible to enroll in certain programs.
Title
Certificate of Completion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#130 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-03-29 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2021-03-23 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported out of Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable by Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-03-19 | House | Added to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1394 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |