FL H1031 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court to consider use of safe exchange location when approving, granting, or modifying parenting plan; requires boards of county commissioners to designate certain areas as safe exchange locations; provides requirements for such areas; provides for immunity from liability.
Title
Designated Safe Exchange Locations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#347 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House Civil Justice Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2023-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-28 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 108, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-28 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Amendment 126071 adopted |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023) |
2023-04-11 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-07 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-03-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-22 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Original reference removed: Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-20 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-16 | House | Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-28 | House | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1286 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |