FL H1029 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides requirements for admissible evidence for claim for residents' rights violation or alleged negligence & corroboration of such claim as to each prospective defendant; provides requirements for specified cause of action; provides immunity from liability for certain individuals; prohibits cause of action to be asserted against certain individuals or entities; provides requirements for residents' records; provides for indemnification of facility under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Claims Against Long-term Care Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-02-28HouseNow in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Healthcare Regulation Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1304 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
400023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4000236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42929Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429293Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429294Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429296Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429297Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429299Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback