FL H1029 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes governmental entity to provide designated parking spaces for Purple Heart recipients; provides requirements for design of such spaces.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purple Heart Recipient Parking Spaces

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseOriginal reference removed: Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-04-02HouseOriginal reference removed: Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-04-01House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-04-01HouseCS Filed
2021-04-01HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-01HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-30HousePCS added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-25HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1320 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3161968Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback