FL H1027 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits child who has been transferred to adult court for criminal prosecution pursuant to direct file from being held in adult jail before hearing; removes references to state attorney's discretion; revises discretionary direct file criteria; requires court to advise child & his or her parent or guardian of child's right to due process evidentiary hearing; authorizes child or child's parent or guardian to request hearing; requires judge to conduct hearing & consider specified information & factors; authorizes judge to consider certain reports; provides for continued jurisdiction; requires adult court to make findings.
Title
Direct Filing of an Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-12-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1498 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
985 | 265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1027 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1027/BillText/Filed/PDF |