FL H1027 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on January 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizes historical, religious, & cultural importance of Jerusalem, supports recognition of Jerusalem as capital of Israel & relocation of U.S. Embassy in Israel to Jerusalem, & applauds Federal Government for recognizing Jerusalem as capital of Israel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital of Israel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31HouseAdopted
2018-01-31HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-25HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18
2018-01-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-24HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-10HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-10HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB
2018-01-03HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-12-18HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback