FL H1025 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes AHCA to seek federal waivers to increase Medicaid funding to provide programs that offer treatment & recovery services to individuals with substance use disorder; creates Office of Drug Control Policy within EOG; provides for appointment of head of office; specifies duties of office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance Abuse Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health Innovation Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-03HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-12-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H865 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S1068 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
S1468 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409912Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback