FL H1023 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides requirements for determining capacity of facilities in certain schools as reported in Florida Inventory of School Houses; requires Commissioner of Education to grant exemption from State Requirements for Educational Facilities to district school board under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Educational Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-03HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-12-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1656 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101337Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101364Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback