FL H1017 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates act "Florida Comprehensive Prison Reform and Redemption Act"; revises provisions for administration of DOC; limits monetary bail to violent felony offenses; modification of sentence on ground that sentence is greater than necessary to achieve purposes of sentencing; creates Florida Innocence Inquiry Commission; requires DOC to provide certain staff with deescalation training & training in responding to incidents involving individuals who have mental illness or cognitive deficits; requires DOC to place prisoners as close as practicable to prisoner's primary residence; requires DOC to submit report concerning availability of & capacity of DOC to treat heroin & opioid abuse through evidence-based programs; requires DJJ to undertake certain pilot programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-07HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-12-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1445 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
903015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9440232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9441415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94417Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94431Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9444732Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9471405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
950021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback