FL H1013 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes SBA & affiliated limited liability entities to issue securities & borrow money through specified means, subject to specified limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08HouseDied in State Affairs Committee
2024-02-08HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2024-02-08HouseReported out of Appropriations Committee
2024-02-08HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee
2024-02-06HouseAdded to Appropriations Committee agenda
2024-02-01HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2024-02-01HouseReported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
2024-02-01HouseFavorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
2024-01-30HouseAdded to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2024-01-08HouseNow in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
2024-01-08HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2024-01-08HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2024-01-08HouseReferred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
2023-12-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1028 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21547Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback