FL H1007 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1064 (Ch. 2023-254)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DCF & community-based care lead agencies to administer trauma screening within specified timeframe to certain children & provide certain follow-up actions under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children Removed from Caregivers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-24 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02HouseLaid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1064 (Ch. 2023-254)
2023-04-28HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2023-04-28HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2023-04-25House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2023-04-25HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/28/2023)
2023-04-25HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2023-04-25HouseCS Filed
2023-04-25HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-04-24HouseReported out of Health & Human Services Committee
2023-04-24HouseFavorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
2023-04-23HouseAdded to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
2023-03-28HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2023-03-28HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2023-03-28HouseOriginal reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-03-28House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2023-03-27HouseCS Filed
2023-03-27HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-03-27HouseReported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2023-03-27HouseFavorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2023-03-23HouseAdded to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
2023-03-07House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-02-28HouseNow in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2023-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1064 (Same As) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-254

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39523Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/Amendment/663487/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/Amendment/788947/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/Analyses/h1007.CFS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/Analyses/h1007a.CFS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/Analyses/h1007b.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/Analyses/h1007c.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/Analyses/h1007z.CFS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/1007/Analyses/h1007z1.CFS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=67969&IsPCB=0&BillId=77788
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=69540&IsPCB=0&BillId=77788

Bill Comments

feedback