FL H1005 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Sheriff of Walton County to provide all child protective investigations in county beginning in FY 2018-2019; specifies funding perameters.
Title
Sheriffs Providing Child Protective Investigative Services
Sponsors
House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. Rick Roth [R] | Rep. Brad Drake [R] | Rep. Clay Ingram [R] |
Rep. Mel Ponder [R] | Rep. Jayer Williamson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-26 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-23 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-20 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-12-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S846 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1079
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1079