FL H1005 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Florida True Origins Of Goods Act"; requires owners & operators of specified websites & online services to disclose certain information; provides for enforcement of act; provides for injunctive relief & civil penalties; provides that violations of act constitute violations of Florida Deceptive & Unfair Trade Practices Act.
Title
Consumer Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1340 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
501 | 980 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 982 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 983 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 984 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 985 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1005 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1005/BillText/Filed/PDF |