FL H0999 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definitions applicable to Florida Security for Public Deposits Act; conforms terminology to changes made by act; revises credit union reporting requirements; revises evidence of insurance required to be submitted by public depositor to CFO.
Title
Public Depositories
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-05 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 414 | |
2011-04-04 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-30 | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 6 -HJ 409 | |
2011-03-28 | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/30/11, 10:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 87 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 87 | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1976 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
280 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
280 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |