FL H0997 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Declares legislative priorities relating to importation & uncontrolled breeding of dogs & cats; requires certain public & private animal shelters, humane organizations, & animal control agencies to prepare & maintain specified records; provides for public availability of such records.
Title
Animal Shelters and Animal Control Agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32) |
2013-04-17 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 674 |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-05 | House | CS/CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/09/13, 2:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2013-04-05 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2013-04-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-04 | House | CS/CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 04/04/13, 10:30 am, Webster Hall |
2013-04-01 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2013-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-27 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/27/13, 4:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0871 (Similar To) 2013-02-19 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)
S0674 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Chapter No. 2013-32
H0839 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)
S0872 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)
S0674 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Chapter No. 2013-32
H0839 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)
S0872 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 674 (Ch. 2013-32)