FL H0993 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1460 (Ch. 2019-135)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Directs AHCA to include certain hospitals on list of stroke centers; requires thrombectomy-capable stroke centers to provide certain information to statewide stroke registry; requires DOH to send list of thrombectomy-capable stroke centers to licensed EMS providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stroke Centers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1460 (Ch. 2019-135)
2019-04-26HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2019-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-17HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-16HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-16HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-28HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-28HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-28HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall -- Removed from meeting agenda
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1460 (Same As) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-135

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3953038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39530381Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953039Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback