FL H0991 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits electronic device from being used to play any lottery game; prohibits DOL from authorizing operation of specified lottery game; requires DOL to include specified warning in all advertisements & promotions of lottery games; requires contracts between DOL & vendor to require vendor to print specified warning on all lottery tickets.
Title
Lottery Games
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee | Rep. Will Robinson [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
Rep. Jennifer Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#535 (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 9 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-24 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-20 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-02-13 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-11 | House | CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 3 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2020-01-27 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | Favorable by Gaming Control Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Gaming Control Subcommittee, 01/27/20, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Gaming Control Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-12-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1318 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |