FL H0987 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Preempts to state regulation of vacation rentals; requires operator of vacation rental to maintain specified liability insurance; revises application requirements for vacation rental licensure; requires Division of Hotels & Restaurants of DBPR to make certain vacation rental license information available on its website; requires sexual offenders to register with local sheriff's office before arrival; requires notification to specified guests; requires online advertisements or postings of public lodging establishment to include certain information.
Title
Public Lodging Establishments
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Business and Professions Subcommittee | Rep. James Grant [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-15 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-10 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 11 |
2019-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/10/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall |
2019-04-01 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2019-03-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/01/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-28 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed -HJ |
Same As/Similar To
S824 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S812 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
S812 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
509 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |