FL H0987 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises functions & divisions of DFS; authorizes CFO to establish divisions, bureaus, or offices of DFS; provides & deletes certain requirements of Florida Clerks of Court Operations Corporation; exempts DFS' audit & accounting positions from career service requirements; provides powers & duties of Division of Consumer Services; authorizes division to impose certain penalties; authorizes DFS to adopt rules relating to division; requires deposit of certain service of process fees into Administrative Trust Fund.
Title
Organization of Department of Financial Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1402 (Same As) 2015-04-29 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/987 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0987/BillText/Filed/PDF |