FL H0983 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for specified information regarding voter or voter registration applicant; authorizes disclosure of confidential & exempt information under certain circumstances; provides for future legislative review & repeal; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Voters and Voter Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Now in Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee |
2021-12-20 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/983 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/983/BillText/Filed/PDF |