FL H0981 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-19 - Veto Message received -HJ 00009; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
Pending: House Rules & Calendar Council Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that land classified as agricultural retains that classification when offered for sale; provides methodology for assessing certain structures & improvements used for horticultural production; authorizes FWCC to enter into agreement with DEP for uniform regulation of pesticides applied to waters of state; revises exemptions from water pollution permits; provides permits for applying pesticides to waters of state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture [EPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0004 - Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0977 - Passage (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-19 Veto Message received -HJ 00009; Veto Message referred to Rules and Calendar Council -HJ 00016
2010-05-15 Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1510 (Ch. 2010-145)
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-27 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01177
2010-04-27 Withdrawn from Agriculture; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00884; Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 2182 -SJ 00884; Read 2nd time -SJ 00884; Read 3rd time -SJ 00884; CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 1 -SJ 00884
2010-04-26 In Messages; Received -SJ 00876; Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00876
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01071; CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 1 -HJ 01071
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00966; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00966
2010-04-15 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00720
2010-04-14 CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -HJ 00681; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-04-09 CS/CS/CS by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00682
2010-04-07 On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 04/09/10, 11:45 am, Morris Hall
2010-04-06 Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00608
2010-04-01 CS read 1st time on 04/01/10 -HJ 00476; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-26 CS/CS by Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -HJ 00478
2010-03-24 On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, 306-H
2010-03-16 Now in Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00300
2010-03-15 CS read 1st time on 03/15/10 -HJ 00278; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-11 CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00280
2010-03-09 On Committee agenda-- Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC), 03/11/10, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00088
2010-02-25 Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Policy (GGPC); Natural Resources Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council
2010-02-09 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2182 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00884; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 981 (Vetoed by Governor) -SJ 00884; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1510 (Ch. 2010-145) -SJ 00884
S1510 (Similar To) 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-145
H7215 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 927 (Ch. 2010-109)
H1445 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S0382 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - In Messages; Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5 (Ch. 2010-230)
S1258 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0193461Amended CodeSee Bill Text
036920Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0403088Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0487163Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0573112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0573118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0581031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
060107Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0981&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb098100.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb098101c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb098102c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb098103c3.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb098104e1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB09810426100977.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB09810427100004.html

Bill Comments

feedback