FL H0965 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Chapter No. 2023-186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Chapter No. 2023-186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the parties that may receive confidential crash reports to include law enforcement agencies and their contracted service providers; requires that motor vehicle registration form and registration renewal form and driver license or ID card application form, respectively, include option to make voluntary contribution to Best Buddies International; defining the terms "control" and "motor vehicle dealer's leasing or rental affiliate", etc.
Title
Driver License, Identification Card, and Motor Vehicle Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#494 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#47 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#171 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#47 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#171 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Infrastructure Strategies Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - House - House Transportation & Modals Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-02 | Chapter No. 2023-186 | |
2023-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-04 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2023-05-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2023-05-04 | House | Amendment 834476 Concur |
2023-05-04 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2023-05-04 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-04 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (834476) |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 996 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023) |
2023-03-29 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-03-29 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-03-28 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-28 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-28 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda |
2023-03-21 | House | Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-17 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-10 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-10 | House | Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-03-10 | House | Favorable by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-28 | House | Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee |
2023-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S996 (Same As) 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 965 (Ch. 2023-186)
H1085 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Fiscal Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 965 (Ch. 2023-186)
H1143 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 965 (Ch. 2023-186)
S1252 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 965 (Ch. 2023-186)
S1388 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 965 (Ch. 2023-186)
H1085 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Fiscal Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 965 (Ch. 2023-186)
H1143 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 965 (Ch. 2023-186)
S1252 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 965 (Ch. 2023-186)
S1388 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Messages; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 965 (Ch. 2023-186)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 0221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |