FL H0961 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-135
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes malt beverage distributor to give branded glassware to vendors licensed to sell malt beverages for on-premises consumption; requires that glassware bear certain branding; provides an annual limit on amount of glassware distributor may give to vendor; prohibits vendor from selling branded glassware or returning it to distributor for cash, credit, or replacement; requires manufacturers, importers, distributors, & vendors to maintain certain records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beverage Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#707 (Y: 101 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Chapter No. 2018-135
2018-03-30 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 898
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1224
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
2018-03-02SenateReceived
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 101 NAYS 13 753
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HouseCS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-22HouseCS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 3
2018-02-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2018-01-30HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2018-01-30HouseFavorable by Careers and Competition Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 7
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Careers and Competition Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-20HouseReferred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-12-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1224 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 961

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
56142Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/Amendment/817745/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/Amendment/398499/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/Amendment/128443/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/Amendment/760987/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/Amendment/790026/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/Amendment/389790/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/Vote/HouseVote_h00961c1707.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/961/Vote/SenateVote_h00961c1034.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback