FL H0957 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits person who engages in privileged communication, law enforcement crime stoppers coordinator or his or her staff, or member of crime stoppers organization's board of directors from being required to disclose privileged communications or produce protected information; provides exception; permits criminal defendant to petition court to inspect protected information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime Stoppers Organizations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#711 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-02SenateReceived
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HouseCS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-22HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-21HouseCS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-02-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-02-13HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-02-13HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 12:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2018-01-31HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-31HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-31HouseCS referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2018-01-31HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-01-30HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-29HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-20HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-12-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S706 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
90595Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback