FL H0955 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires contracts between AHCA & certain managed care plans to require plans to submit specified annual report to agency for parity between mental health & substance use disorder benefits, & medical and surgical benefits; deletes certain provisions requiring insurers and specified health service entities transacting certain insurance or prepaid health care to offer specified optional coverage for mental & nervous disorders; requires such entities to comply with specified provisions prohibiting imposition of less favorable benefit limitations on mental health & substance use disorder benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Coverage Parity for Mental Health and Substance Use Disorders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health Innovation Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-20HouseReferred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-12-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1422 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6274193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627668Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback