FL H0955 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides alternative requirement for DOR to distribute certain sales tax proceeds to certain performing arts centers rather than to certain sports franchise facilities; provides for construction; provides limitation; requires OTTED to screen applicants & approve or deny applications for certification as performing arts centers for funding purposes; requires OTTED to establish certain procedures & guidelines; provides criteria for certification of performing arts centers, etc.
Title
Performing Arts Centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 83 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 83 | |
2011-02-23 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/955 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0955/BillText/Filed/HTML |