FL H0953 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-247
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-247
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies when arrest warrant may be issued; authorizes judge to electronically sign arrest & search warrants if certain conditions are met; provides that such warrants deemed electronically issued & signed by judge at time judge affixes his or her electronic signature to warrant.
Title
Warrants
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Pilon [R] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#103 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#103 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Chapter No. 2013-247 | |
2013-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-25 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 962 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Criminal Justice |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-12 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/13 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/20/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-15 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-12 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/12/13, 10:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0962 (Same As) 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 953 (Ch. 2013-247)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
901 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
933 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |