FL H0951 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain assessment results be provided to parents within specified timeframe; requires OEL to aggregate specified assessment results to be distributed to certain entities & posted on office's website; authorizes certain students to reenroll in VPK; provides funding & criteria & procedures for reenrollment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary Prekindergarten Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-25HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-24HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-24HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-23HouseCS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-20HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2017-12-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1192 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100267Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100271Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback