FL H0947 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Volusia County to permit vehicular traffic upon a portion of coastal beach not previously permitted for such traffic for a specified purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volusia County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#50 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#475 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09 Approved by Governor
2020-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-11HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-02-26SenateReceived
2020-02-24SenateReferred to Rules
2020-02-20SenateIn Messages
2020-02-20HousePassed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2020-02-20HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-19HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-02-19HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-30HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2020-01-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/30/20, 11:30 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-16HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-01-16HouseFavorable by Local Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Administration Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Local Administration Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-12-13HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16158Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback