FL H0947 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises deadlines for submission of documentation regarding involuntary examinations; establishes priority for mental health training by school resource officers & school safety officers; requires parental notification prior to removing student for involuntary examination; revises responsibilities of DOE & Statewide Office for Suicide Prevention; revises criteria for designation as Certified Suicide Prevention School; requires department, school district, & each school to post certain information regarding Certified Suicide Prevention Schools on its website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Health of Minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#795 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Messages
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-05SenateIn Messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-12HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2018-02-09HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-07HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/07/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-05HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-02-01HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-02-01HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-12-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S270 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012583Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944599Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback